NH HB705 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB705
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/20/2020; Chapter 24; I. Sec. 1-7 & 9-16 Eff: 09/18/2020 II. Sec 18 Eff: 01/16/2021 III. Rem Eff: 7/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/20/2020; Chapter 24; I. Sec. 1-7 & 9-16 Eff: 09/18/2020 II. Sec 18 Eff: 01/16/2021 III. Rem Eff: 7/20/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to sexual assault, sexual misconduct in institutions of higher education, and the rights of victims of crime.
Title
Relative to sexual assault, sexual misconduct in institutions of higher education, and the rights of victims of crime.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - Concur (Y: 254 N: 75 NV: 23 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/20/2020; Chapter 24; I. Sec. 1-7 & 9-16 Eff: 09/18/2020 II. Sec 18 Eff: 01/16/2021 III. Rem Eff: 7/20/2020 |
2020-07-14 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-07-14 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 73 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1618: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2020-1618e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-30 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 254-75 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 20 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1496s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1496s: Sections 1-10 and Sections 13-19, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1496s: Sections 11-12 and 19, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to divide the Question on Ought to Pass with Amendment: Sections 11-12 and 19: Sections 1-10, and Sections 13-19; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1496s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | The following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 5. Webinar ID: 921 4734 0764 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,92147340764# or 19292056099,,92147340764# Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | 1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_06XzVPTbTGKeSq6WjiSJbw Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Members of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Committee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/12/2020, 01:05 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1305s; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 06/12/2020, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 22 |
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-05 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0048h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2020-03-05 | House | Amendment # 2020-0048h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 4 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0048h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 21-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 31 |
2020-01-10 | House | Division I Work Session: 01/21/2020 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2020-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2806h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 79 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2806h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 79 |
2020-01-08 | House | Referred to Finance 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 79 |
2019-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2806h (NT) (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 19 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2019-10-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-09-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/11/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 09/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-06-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-12 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 27 |
Same As/Similar To
HB705 (Carry Over) 2019-11-15 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2806h (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar)