NH HB692 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 268; Eff: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to dental care for Medicaid recipients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dental care for Medicaid recipients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - House - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 268; Eff: 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-27HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1465s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 9
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1465s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1465s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1465s, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-28Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 16
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0748h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0748h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0748h for 03/14/2019 (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7
2019-02-28HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13HousePublic Hearing: 02/19/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 26

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback