NH HB685 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2779h (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to ambulance billing, payment for reasonable value of services, and prohibition on balance billing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to ambulance billing, payment for reasonable value of services, and prohibition on balance billing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2779h (Vote 13-5; Regular Calendar)
2019-10-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/23/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-10-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-09-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-09-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-08-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-06-17HouseFull Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-03-08HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-28HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2019-02-27HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 03/06/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 25

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback