NH HB685 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-119; House Journal 24, PG. 861-863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-119; House Journal 24, PG. 861-863
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a state agency, state employee, or political subdivision from enforcing any federal law regarding a firearm, firearm accessory, or ammunition.
Title
Prohibiting a state agency, state employee, or political subdivision from enforcing any federal law regarding a firearm, firearm accessory, or ammunition.
Sponsors
Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 234 N: 119 NV: 44 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-119; House Journal 24, PG. 861-863 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 12-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 419-420 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 235 |