NH HB683 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 842
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulating cash for gold businesses.
Title
Regulating cash for gold businesses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 842 |
2015-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 9-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 416 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Seesion: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-10 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 235 |