NH HB668 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 37; Eff: 07/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to heating, agitating or other devices in public waters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to heating, agitating or other devices in public waters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 05/15/2019; Chapter 37; Eff: 07/14/2019
2019-05-07HouseEnrolled 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 42
2019-05-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-04-18SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/18/2019; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/18/2019; Senate Calendar 18
2019-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; the committee will meet at 1:00 p.m. or 30 minutes following the end of session; Senate Calendar 17A
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 35
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13
2019-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback