NH HB666 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB666
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recounts in elections.
Title
Relative to recounts in elections.
Sponsors
Rep. David Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-04 | House | Executive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-09-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-08-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 08/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 3 P. 24 |
Same As/Similar To
HB666 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)