NH HB666 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 258; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 258; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to licensing of money transmitters.
Title
Relative to licensing of money transmitters.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/13/2015; Chapter 258; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-07-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2140 |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2339e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2339e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1499s (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG. 1988 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1499s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1499s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1499s, 5/7/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 100, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0681h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 774-777 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0681h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 774-777 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0681h for Mar 11 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 394 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 234 |