NH HB664 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0260
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire vaccine association.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire vaccine association.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Harding [D] | Rep. John Hunt [R] | Sen. Peggy Gilmour [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - C OF C #2172C (Y: 235 N: 115 NV: 30 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 9 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 1-8 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Reconsideration of vote (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 9 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 1-8 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment 2025s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 9 (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 1-8 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Reconsideration of vote (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 9 (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment Sections 1-8 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment 2025s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Effective 07/24/2013; Chapter 0260 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-2197e Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 52, PG.1716 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2197e Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2172c Adopted, Regular Calendar 235-115; House Journal 52, PG.1702-1704 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2172c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2172c; As Passed by the House, Filed |
2013-06-18 | House | ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/20/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==RECESSED== |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Bradley, Forrester, Pierce |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Butler, K.Williams, Harding, and Cote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1651 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1713s and #2025s(NT) and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1651 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1713s and 2025s New Title, Sections 9 and 10, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Motion Adopted;OT3rdg |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1713s and 2025s New Title, Sections 1-8 and 10, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Cataldo Moved Reconsideration of vote on Ought to Pass with Amendments 1713s and 2025s New Title, Sections 1-8 and 10, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Cataldo Moved Reconsideration of vote on Ought to Pass with Amendments 1713s and 2025s New Title, Sections 9 and 10, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1713s and 2025s New Title, Sections 9 and 10, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 1713s and 2025s New Title, Sections 1-8 and 10, Regular Calendar 22Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-06-06 | Senate | The Chair Ruled the Question Divisible: Sections 1-8 and Section 9 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Soucy Moved to Divide the Question: Sections 1-8 and Section 9 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment #2013-2025s New Title, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1713s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Cataldo Moved to Table, Motion Failed, Voice Vote |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 664 is Special Ordered to the end of the Regular Calendar, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1713s, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 664 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1713s, 5/30/13; Senate Calendar 22 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Without Objection, HB 664 is Special Ordered to the Next Session Day, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1713s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: === ROOM CHANGE === 4/9/13, Room 100, State House, 2:40 p.m. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce |
2013-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0686h: Motion Adopted Division Vote 291-53; House Journal 26, PG.802-805 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amendment #0686h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.802-805 |
2013-03-06 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0686h; House Calendar 22, PG.567-569 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0686h for Mar 13 (Vote 15-4; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.521 |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/5/2013 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-13 | House | Public Hearing: 2/22/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 17, PG.328 |
2013-02-13 | House | Vacated from Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs (Rep J.MacKay): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.328 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 12, PG.205 |