NH HB662 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 195-119 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 119
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study occupational licensing reforms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study occupational licensing reforms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 195-119 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 119
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 27
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback