NH HB661 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2559h (NT)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2559h (NT)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to record keeping for sold or transferred animals.
Title
Relative to record keeping for sold or transferred animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2559h (NT) |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2508h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 6-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 21-22 |
2015-10-21 | House | ==CONTINUED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-10-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 10/29/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/21/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306==Recessed== |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-05-26 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-05-05 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG. 234 |