NH HB661 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 257-56; House Journal 29, PG.989-990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 257-56; House Journal 29, PG.989-990
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allocating a portion of proceeds from forfeiture of items used in connection with a drug offense to the cold case homicide unit.
Title
Allocating a portion of proceeds from forfeiture of items used in connection with a drug offense to the cold case homicide unit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 257-56; House Journal 29, PG.989-990 |
2013-02-28 | House | Proposed Minority Amendment #2013-0543h; House Calendar 23 PG.643-644 |
2013-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0543h; House Calendar 23 PG.589 |
2013-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 20 (Vote 14-6; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.589 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG.205 |