NH HB660 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 218; Eff: 07/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to studying the economic and other impacts of OHRV use in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to studying the economic and other impacts of OHRV use in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/12/2019; Chapter 218; Eff: 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1850s (Rep. Suzanne Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1850s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1850s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1850s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-01SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0953h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 34
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0953h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 34
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0953h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 13
2019-03-06HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-28HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-15HousePublic Hearing: 02/26/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305-307
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 3 P. 24

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback