NH HB656 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB656

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-24 - Executive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the legalization and regulation of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the legalization and regulation of marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - Interim Study (Y: 153 N: 135 NV: 70 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 139 NV: 13 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - House - ITL (Y: 162 N: 183 NV: 14 Abs: 33) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-24HouseExecutive Session: 10/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
2018-08-16HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building202
2018-03-22HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 153-135 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 48
2018-03-21HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Cushing) 03/21/2018 House Journal 9 P. 2
2018-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/21/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 4
2018-03-14HouseExecutive Session: 03/12/2018 Legislative Office Building 202
2018-03-12House==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/12/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2018-02-27House==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/08/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2018-02-01HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-09HouseReferred to Ways and Means 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 12
2018-01-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2478h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-139 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 10
2018-01-09HouseAmendment # 2017-2478h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 7
2018-01-09HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 162-183 01/09/2018 House Journal 2 P. 5
2018-01-03HouseSpecial Order to second order of business on 1/9/2018 (Rep. White): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 55
2017-11-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2478h (NT)
2017-11-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
2017-10-05HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/12/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201
2017-10-04HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/11/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-09-19HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 10/04/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-09-18HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/19/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-09-06HouseExecutive Session: 11/14/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-05-17HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 05/23/2017 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-02-16HouseRetained in Committee
2017-02-01HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Representatives Hall
2017-01-25HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 24

Same As/Similar To

HB656 (Carry Over) 2017-11-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2478h (NT)

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=543&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB656
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=502&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=502
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=15&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0656&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB656&ddlsponsors=&lsr=543
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=16&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0656&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB656&ddlsponsors=&lsr=543
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=173&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB0656&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB656&ddlsponsors=&lsr=543

Bill Comments

feedback