NH HB656 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to inspection of governmental records under the right-to-know law.
Title
Relative to inspection of governmental records under the right-to-know law.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Leeman [R] | Rep. Warren Groen [R] | Rep. James Webb [R] | Rep. Katherine Prudhomme-O'Brien [R] |
Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. Steven Beaudoin [R] | Rep. Eric Schleien [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 795 |
2015-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 11 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 404 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG. 234 |