NH HB65 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the first labor strike in the United States by women.
Title
Commemorating the first labor strike in the United States by women.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Gallager [D] | Rep. Amanda Toll [D] | Rep. Cassandra Levesque [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Nicholas Germana [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2023 House Journal 4 |
2023-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/17/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2023-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |