NH HB649 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making emergency medical technicians and rescue squad members eligible for a death benefit if killed in the line of duty.
Title
Making emergency medical technicians and rescue squad members eligible for a death benefit if killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Proulx [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Senate | Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 12Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/18/2017; Senate Calendar 23 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-1468s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-1468s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/27/2017; Senate Journal 15 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1468s, 04/27/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Hearing: 04/18/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/23/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0845h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 17 |
2017-03-23 | House | Amendment #2017-0845h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 17 |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0845h for 03/23/2017 (Vote 26-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 5 |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 03/02/2017 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division II Work Session: 02/28/2017 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0375h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment #2017-0375h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0375h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11 |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-25 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 23 |