NH HB648 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to van parking for persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to van parking for persons with disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-30HouseDied on Table
2017-03-09HouseLay on Table (Rep. M. MacKay): Motion Adopted DV 193-149 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 56
2017-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 10-4; Regular Calendar)
2017-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 02/22/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback