NH HB648 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 74; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 74; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring detention until arraignment for persons arrested for violation of protective orders.
Title
Requiring detention until arraignment for persons arrested for violation of protective orders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 74; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Moved Ought to Pass |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing: 3/31/15, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0616h: Motion Adopted DV 255-99; House Journal 24, PG. 855-856 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0616h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 855-856 |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0616h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 418 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/2/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 234 |