NH HB648 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by Governor 06/20/2013; Effective 06/20/2013; Chapter 0089
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by Governor 06/20/2013; Effective 06/20/2013; Chapter 0089
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting current marital masters to remain in office until retirement, resignation, disability, or nonrenewal of appointment.
Title
Permitting current marital masters to remain in office until retirement, resignation, disability, or nonrenewal of appointment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - House - OTP/AM 0529H (Y: 206 N: 142 NV: 49 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor 06/20/2013; Effective 06/20/2013; Chapter 0089 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/2/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/9/13, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0529h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-142; House Journal 27, PG.876-879 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment #0529h: Amendment Adopted Division Vote 199-142; House Journal 27, PG.876-877 |
2013-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 23 PG.593-594 |
2013-02-26 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0529h; House Calendar 23 PG.643 |
2013-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0529h for Mar 20 (Vote 11-5; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.593-594 |
2013-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 ==RECESSED== |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 12, PG.204 |