NH HB647 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Lay HB647 on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted DV 333-37 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Lay HB647 on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted DV 333-37 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to causes of action for individual rights.
Title
Relative to causes of action for individual rights.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Tom Mannion [R] | Rep. Daniel Popovici-Muller [R] |
Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Lay HB647 on Table (Rep. Alexander Jr.): Motion Adopted DV 333-37 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 56 |
2023-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0231h 02/08/2023 |
2023-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB647-FN 02/08/2023 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 16 |
2023-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 24 |