NH HB647 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to withholding of wages.
Title
Relative to withholding of wages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | House Signed By Governor 06/07/2011; Effective 08/06/2011; Chapter 0140 | |
2011-06-01 | House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.547 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 17, Pg.357 | |
2011-05-18 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 17, Pg.347 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/18/11; Senate Calendar 24 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/10/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 11, Pg.194 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.728 | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.536 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 | |
2011-02-10 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/22/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 (Orig 2:30 PM) | |
2011-01-31 | House Introduced 1/26/2011 and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 14, PG.265 |