NH HB646 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB646
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-16 - Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to labeling, signage, and restrictions on the sales and use of bee-toxic pesticides.
Title
Relative to labeling, signage, and restrictions on the sales and use of bee-toxic pesticides.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120 |
2020-01-08 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 107 |
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 13-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 22 |
2019-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-10-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/08/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB646 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate