NH HB646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB646
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the placement and detention of a minor in a secure facility.
Title
Relative to the placement and detention of a minor in a secure facility.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 35 |
2017-11-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-19 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-09-11 | House | Division III Retained Bill Work Session: 09/28/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 212 |
2017-03-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Division III Work Session: 03/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 03/13/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 03/13/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division III Work Session: 03/06/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-21 | House | Division III Work Session: 03/01/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2017-02-15 | House | Referred to Finance 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2017-02-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0347h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2017-02-15 | House | Amendment # 2017-0347h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 21 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-0347h for 02/15/2017 (Vote 14-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-02-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/07/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB646 (Carry Over) 2017-11-16 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar)