NH HB646 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-25 - Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to New Hampshire correctional industries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to New Hampshire correctional industries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-11-25HouseCommittee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 8 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2013-10-16HouseRetained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-10-02HouseRetained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-05-29HouseRetained Bill - Full Committee Organizational Work Session: 6/4/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-02-12HouseRetained in Committee
2013-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 2/12/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-31HousePublic Hearing: 2/7/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
2013-01-03HouseIntroduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 12, PG.204

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback