NH HB645 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to retiree health care benefits for future retirees.
Title
Relative to retiree health care benefits for future retirees.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2017 House Journal 7 P. 13 |
2017-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/15/2017 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11 |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 23 |