NH HB644 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 73; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 73; Effective Date 1/1/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulation of small loans, title loans, and payday loans.
Title
Relative to regulation of small loans, title loans, and payday loans.
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 73; Effective Date 1/1/2016 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/30/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/23/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 4/7/15, Room 100, State House, 1:45 p.m.; Senate Calendar 16 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0680h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 773-774 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0680h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 773-774 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought To Pass with Amendment #2015-0680h for Mar 11 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 394 |
2015-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 12, PG. 233 |