NH HB641 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB641
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to clearance inspections following identification of a lead exposure hazard.
Title
Relative to clearance inspections following identification of a lead exposure hazard.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 60 |
2023-11-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB641-FN 11/08/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 17 |
2023-09-26 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-05-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-30 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 23 |
Same As/Similar To
HB641 (Carry Over) 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39