NH HB641 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Without Objection, Sen. Hennessey Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing municipalities to collect an occupancy fee from operators of local room rentals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allowing municipalities to collect an occupancy fee from operators of local room rentals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Laid on Table (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - OTPA (Y: 209 N: 146 NV: 23 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 194 N: 151 NV: 11 Abs: 44) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30SenateWithout Objection, Sen. Hennessey Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenatePending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2019-2224s; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 20Y-4N, Motion Adopted; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2224s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-22SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2224s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/01/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:30 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-146 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 63
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1159h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/04/2019 House Journal 12 P. 63
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1159h for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 7
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-28HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 13
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0438h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-151 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 10
2019-02-28HouseAmendment # 2019-0438h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 10
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0438h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 23
2019-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/14/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-30House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/05/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-23House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/29/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=756&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB641
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=800&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=800
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=800
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=58&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0641&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB641&ddlsponsors=&lsr=756
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=155&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0641&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB641&ddlsponsors=&lsr=756
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=173&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0641&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB641&ddlsponsors=&lsr=756

Bill Comments

feedback