NH HB640 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 248; Eff. 9/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the penalties for possession of marijuana.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the penalties for possession of marijuana.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment 1693s (Y: 4 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Sen. Gannon Floor Amendment 1692s (Y: 7 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1619s (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - OTP (Y: 318 N: 36 NV: 10 Abs: 31) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-20HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/18/2017; Chapter 248; Eff. 9/16/2017
2017-07-05HouseEnrolled 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 27
2017-07-03SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-23HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2217e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/22/2017 House Journal 19 P. 23
2017-06-23SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-2217e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/22/2017); Senate Journal 20
2017-06-01HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1619s (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 2
2017-05-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1619s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateSen. Gannon Floor Amendment #2017-1693s, Regular Calendar 4Y-19N, Amendment Failed; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateSen. Gannon Floor Amendment #2017-1692s, Regular Calendar 7Y-16N, Amendment Failed; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-1619s, Regular Calendar 18Y-5N, Amendment Adopted; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11SenateSpecial Order HB 640 to the beginning of the Judiciary Committee, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1619s, 05/11/2017; Senate Calendar 22
2017-04-05SenateHearing: 04/11/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 18
2017-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9
2017-03-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 318-36 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 67
2017-02-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar)
2017-02-08HouseExecutive Session: 02/07/2017 Legislative Office Building 204
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 01:00 PM Representatives Hall
2017-01-24HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=69&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB640
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=69&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=57&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=HB0640&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB640&ddlsponsors=&lsr=69
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=135&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0640&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB640&ddlsponsors=&lsr=69
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=136&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0640&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB640&ddlsponsors=&lsr=69
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=137&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0640&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB640&ddlsponsors=&lsr=69
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=138&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=HB0640&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=HB640&ddlsponsors=&lsr=69

Bill Comments

feedback