NH HB640 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1026
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notice to the department of health and human services of the allocation of spousal income and relative to estate planning by guardians.
Title
Relative to notice to the department of health and human services of the allocation of spousal income and relative to estate planning by guardians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 30, PG.1026 | |
2011-03-15 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Kurk); House Journal 26, PG.694 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.535 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-02-23 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 (If Necessary Continued 3/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208) | |
2011-02-16 | House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 11, PG. 194 |