NH HB639 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.
Title
Relative to the legalization and regulation of cannabis and making appropriations therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 272 N: 109 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 272 N: 109 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 272 N: 109 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - OTPA (Y: 272 N: 109 NV: 12 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-11 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Special Order to after lunch break, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/11/2023; Senate Journal 14 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/11/2023; Senate Calendar 21A |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Hearing: 04/20/2023, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Introduced 03/30/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1231h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 272-109 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 239 |
2023-04-06 | House | Amendment # 2023-1231h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2023 House Journal 12 P. 228 |
2023-03-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2023-03-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1231h 03/27/2023 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) |
2023-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/21/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 03/13/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 32 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0543h: Motion Adopted DV 234-127 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 32 |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2023-0543h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 18 |
2023-02-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-02-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0543h 02/15/2023 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 10 |
2023-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/15/2023 10:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2023 00:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/07/2023 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2023-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:15 pm State House Reps Hall |
2023-01-12 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 23 |