NH HB636 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1952s and 1966s and 1949s (Reps. Tholl, Kurk): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-77 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1952s and 1966s and 1949s (Reps. Tholl, Kurk): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-77 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to forfeiture of property; relative to the sale of premixed synthetic urine; establishing a grant program for high schools for heroin and opiate prevention education; and clarifying who may petition to adopt.
Title
Relative to forfeiture of property; relative to the sale of premixed synthetic urine; establishing a grant program for high schools for heroin and opiate prevention education; and clarifying who may petition to adopt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - House - Non Concur (Y: 209 N: 77 NV: 59 Abs: 53) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass: Sections 5-8, and 9 I and III (Y: 5 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass: Sections 1-4, and 9 II-III (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass: Sections 5-8, and 9 I and III (Y: 5 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass: Sections 1-4, and 9 II-III (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1952s and 1966s and 1949s (Reps. Tholl, Kurk): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 209-77 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 18 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments #1952s, New Title and #1966s, New Title and #1949s, New Title; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, OT3rdg; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Pierce Floor Amendment #2016-1949s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2016-1966s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Floor Amendment #2016-1952s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1823s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/12/2016 Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Special Order HB 636 to the end of the Regular Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1823s, New Title, 05/12/2016; Senate Calendar 18 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Sections 1-4 and 9 II-III, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Sections 5-8 and 9 I and III, Regular Calendar 5Y-18N, Motion Failed; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Sections 1-4 and 9 II-III, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | The Chair ruled the Question Divisible Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Forrester Moved to divide the Question on Ought to Pass: Sections 1-4 and 9 II-III;Sections 5-8 and 9 I and III; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Special Order HB 636 to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2016, Room 100, State House, 12:30 pm, or Immediately Following Session if Session goes beyond 12:00 p.m. Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Introduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0885h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 15 |
2016-03-23 | House | Amendment #2016-0885h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 15 |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0885h for 03/23/2016 (Vote 18-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 7 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2016-02-19 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210 |
2016-02-10 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/16/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-02-03 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/08/2016 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-01-28 | House | Division I Work Session: 02/03/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 212 |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Finance 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 21 |
2016-01-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2507h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 21 |
2016-01-07 | House | FLAM #2015-3050h (Rep. Horrigan): Amendment Failed DV 153-156 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 21 |
2016-01-07 | House | Amendment #2015-2507h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 21 |
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2507h for Jan 6 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 24 |
2015-09-21 | House | ==TIME CHANGE==Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-09-21 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-09-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-09-18 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/1/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-08-24 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/10/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2015 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2015-02-04 | House | Vacated from Criminal Justice and Public Safety and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 14, PG. 273 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 233 |