NH HB635 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - House Law Without Signature 06/16/2011; Effective 06/16/2011; Chapter 0200; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - House Law Without Signature 06/16/2011; Effective 06/16/2011; Chapter 0200; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the governor to consolidate certain agency functions and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Requiring the governor to consolidate certain agency functions and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. William Belvin [R] | Rep. Candace Bouchard [D] | Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Rep. Ken Hawkins [R] |
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | House Law Without Signature 06/16/2011; Effective 06/16/2011; Chapter 0200; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 18, Pg.391 | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 18, Pg.384 | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/25/11; Senate Calendar 25 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing on proposed amendment #1742s to HB 635-FN-A; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Sen. Morse Moved Recommit to Finance, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.305 | |
2011-05-04 | Senate Committee Amendment 1668s Not Voted On; Senate Journal 15 | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1668s, New Title, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Hearing: 4/28/11, Room 103, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 21 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 12, Pg.244 | |
2011-03-30 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG.1101 | |
2011-03-14 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 30 (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 27, PG.819 | |
2011-03-02 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/9/2011 4:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==Executive Session to Follow== | |
2011-02-23 | House Referred to Finance; House Journal 21, PG.473 | |
2011-02-23 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.473 | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 23 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.276 | |
2011-02-10 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 Legislative Office Building 306 1:30 PM or 45 minutes after House Session | |
2011-02-10 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/14/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-02 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/17/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 194 |