NH HB634 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2401h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to applying the interest and dividends tax to trusts, increasing exemptions, and extending the tax to capital gains; and relative to homeowners property tax relief.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to applying the interest and dividends tax to trusts, increasing exemptions, and extending the tax to capital gains; and relative to homeowners property tax relief.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2401h
2015-11-12HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 29-30
2015-09-23HouseExecutive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-22House==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 9/29/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-21HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-09-16HouseExecutive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-10HouseRetained in Committee
2015-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 2/10/2015 10:10 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-03House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/6/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2015-02-02HouseContinued Public Hearing: 2/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2015-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/2/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 ==RECESSED==
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 233

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback