NH HB631 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1745s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a deaf child's bill of rights and an advisory council on the education of deaf children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a deaf child's bill of rights and an advisory council on the education of deaf children.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1745s (Rep. Weber): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1745s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1745s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1745s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-05-15SenateSpecial Order to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-04-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1745s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-24Senate==RECONVENE== Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-11Senate==RECESSED== Hearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-19SenateIntroduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 9
2019-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0638h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 8
2019-03-07HouseAmendment # 2019-0638h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 8
2019-02-27HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0638h for 03/07/2019 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5
2019-02-27House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-20House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-20HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-13HouseDivision II Subcommittee Work Session: 02/19/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-02-06HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2019 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback