NH HB631 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB631
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a cash balance pension plan for new hires and non-vested employees.
Title
Establishing a cash balance pension plan for new hires and non-vested employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Frank Byron [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Carl Seidel [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Gary Azarian [R] | Rep. Bill Ohm [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-09-11 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-08-22 | House | ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/24/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-08 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB631 (Carry Over) 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-6; Regular Calendar)