NH HB631 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-134; House Journal 21, PG.466-468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-134; House Journal 21, PG.466-468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that all school districts offer public kindergarten.
Title
Repealing the requirement that all school districts offer public kindergarten.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - ITL (Y: 213 N: 134 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 213-134; House Journal 21, PG.466-468 | |
2011-02-17 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 15, PG.275 | |
2011-02-17 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 23 (Vote 12-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.275 | |
2011-02-02 | House Executive Session: 2/10/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/8/2011 3:00 PM Representative's Hall | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 194 |