NH HB630 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB630
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a publicly transparent interdepartmental health information and analysis program for New Hampshire and establishing a special fund.
Title
Relative to the establishment of a publicly transparent interdepartmental health information and analysis program for New Hampshire and establishing a special fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building205 |
2018-01-03 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 38 |
2017-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-09-08 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/31/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-07 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/01/2017 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 3 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB630 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)