NH HB630 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2474h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-15 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2474h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire video lottery.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire video lottery.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan McGuire [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] |
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2474h |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 29 |
2015-10-06 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Executive Session: 10/14/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-10-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/8/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-22 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-16 | House | ==CANCELED==Executive Session: 10/29/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-09-15 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-08-31 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 9/15/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-08-31 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 9/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 9/10/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 12, PG. 233 |