NH HB63 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-30 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the reversal or forgiveness of emergency order violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the reversal or forgiveness of emergency order violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 169 NV: 10 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 156 N: 196 NV: 14 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - OTPA (Y: 188 N: 169 NV: 12 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 156 N: 196 NV: 18 Abs: 28) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30HouseRetained in Committee
2021-03-25HouseExecutive Session: 03/29/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92166004660
2021-03-04HouseDivision I Work Session: 03/09/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94444579237
2021-02-24HouseReferred to Finance 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 23
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment : Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-169 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 23
2021-02-24HouseLay on Table (Rep. Conley): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 156-196 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 23
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0079h: Amendment Adopted DV 199-155 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 23
2021-02-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0079h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 16
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/27/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91386255102 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 33

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB63
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=2&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=2
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=14&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0063&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB63&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=15&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0063&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB63&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=14&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0063&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB63&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0002
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=15&sy=2021&lb=H&eb=HB0063&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=HB63&ddlsponsors=&lsr=0002

Bill Comments 750

feedback