NH HB629 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB629
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.
Title
Relative to the home cultivation of cannabis plants and the possession of certain cannabis-infused products.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Kevin Verville [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 9 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Inexpedient to Legislate; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 9Y-15N, Motion Failed; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Kahn Floor Amendment # 2022-1885s, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Special Order to after lunch, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Special Order to the next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Special Order to the end of today's Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/07/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Somssich): Motion Failed Voice Vote 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 241-113 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Failed DV 122-231 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2022-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Abbas): Motion Failed DV 144-210 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-11-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB629-FN 10/20/2021 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 25 |
2021-10-13 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/28/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-03-29 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/27/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91386255102 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-14 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 57 |
Same As/Similar To
HB629 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Executive Session: 10/20/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203