NH HB628 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 333; I. Sec. 2 Eff: as provided in Sec. 3 II. Rem. Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-21 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 333; I. Sec. 2 Eff: as provided in Sec. 3 II. Rem. Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to universal changing stations in certain places of public accommodation.
Title
Relative to universal changing stations in certain places of public accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - Adopt CofC Report (Y: 205 N: 136 NV: 26 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 211 N: 133 NV: 20 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 211 N: 133 NV: 20 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-21 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/16/2019; Chapter 333; I. Sec. 2 Eff: as provided in Sec. 3 II. Rem. Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-07-29 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 59 |
2019-07-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2662e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 57 |
2019-07-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2662e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Conference Committee Report 2561c: Adopted, Regular Calendar 205-136 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 48 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2019-2561c; Division Vote 14Y-10N, Adopted; 06/27/2019; Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Warden) 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 31 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2019-2561c; 06/27/2019 |
2019-06-14 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/18/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Cavanaugh, Chandley; (In Recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-06-11 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Williams, Le, Van Houten, Potucek 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42 |
2019-06-11 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2034s and Requests CofC (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2034s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2034s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2034s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0929h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-133 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0929h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0929h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 20 |
2019-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/08/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 22 |