NH HB628 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 207-143; House Journal 24, PG.689-690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 207-143; House Journal 24, PG.689-690
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to underground storage tank and above ground storage tank certification.
Title
Relative to underground storage tank and above ground storage tank certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Division Vote 207-143; House Journal 24, PG.689-690 |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 20, PG.420 |
2013-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 6 (Vote 13-7; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.420 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-02-06 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.203 |