NH HB626 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of criminal records.
Title
Relative to annulment of criminal records.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Stone [R] | Rep. Caleb Dyer [L] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-03-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Welch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2017 House Journal 10 P. 63 |
2017-03-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Hoell) 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 7 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2017 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-24 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 22 |