NH HB626 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2326h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2326h
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing energy infrastructure development and designating energy infrastructure corridors.
Title
Authorizing energy infrastructure development and designating energy infrastructure corridors.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Smith [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Rep. Rebecca Brown [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Susan Ford [D] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Sen. Jeanie Forrester [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2326h |
2015-07-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 26-27 |
2015-06-24 | House | Executive Session: 6/30/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-06-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/23/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-03-03 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/19/2015 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-11 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 4:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 4:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 233 |