NH HB624 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study management systems and customer service of New Hampshire government agencies.
Title
Establishing a commission to study management systems and customer service of New Hampshire government agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0311h: Motion Adopted DV 190-122 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 118 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0311h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 118 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0311h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 26 |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 02/07/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 22 |