NH HB624 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - House Signed By Governor 04/23/2012; Effective 04/23/2012; Chapter 0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-24 - House Signed By Governor 04/23/2012; Effective 04/23/2012; Chapter 0011
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the rulemaking authority of state agencies to establish fees.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the rulemaking authority of state agencies to establish fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-24 | House Signed By Governor 04/23/2012; Effective 04/23/2012; Chapter 0011 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.384 | |
2012-04-11 | House Enrolled | |
2012-04-11 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1396s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.328 | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1396s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.262; Senate Journal 8, Pg.263 | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2012-1396s, New Title, 3/28/12; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-08 | Senate Hearing: 3/15/12, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2012-02-15 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 6, Pg.145 | |
2012-01-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2775h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.401-402 | |
2012-01-04 | House Amendment #2775h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 7, PG.401-402 | |
2011-11-01 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2775h (New Title); House Calendar 69, PG.2182 | |
2011-11-01 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2775h(NT) for Jan 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 70, PG.2205 | |
2011-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 (If Necessary Continued 11/1/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306) | |
2011-10-20 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/26/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-09-23 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/4/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-09-22 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/28/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-05-25 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-03 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-03-02 | House Executive Session: 3/2/2011 Legislative Office Building 301 Following House Session | |
2011-02-02 | House Public Hearing: 2/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 194 |