NH HB623 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the rates of the business profits tax and business enterprise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the rates of the business profits tax and business enterprise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - OTPA (Y: 200 N: 141 NV: 15 Abs: 44) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseRetained in Committee
2019-03-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2019-03-14HouseFinance Division I Work Session: 03/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 212
2019-02-28HouseReferred to Finance 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 27
2019-02-28HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0416h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-141 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 24
2019-02-28HouseAmendment # 2019-0416h: Amendment Adopted DV 234-95 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 24
2019-02-20HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-20HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0416h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 26
2019-02-06HouseExecutive Session: 02/12/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-04HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/07/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16HouseIntroduced 01/03/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 3 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback