NH HB623 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - House Law Without Signature 06/29/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0227; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - House Law Without Signature 06/29/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0227; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting preferences in recruiting, hiring, promotion, or admission by state agencies, the university system, the community college system, and the postsecondary education commission.
Title
Prohibiting preferences in recruiting, hiring, promotion, or admission by state agencies, the university system, the community college system, and the postsecondary education commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - OTP (REP JASPER) (Y: 219 N: 79 NV: 100 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 101 N: 197 NV: 100 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 101 N: 197 NV: 100 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | House Law Without Signature 06/29/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0227; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1728 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2212s (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1720 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 19, Pg.539 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 2212s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 19, Pg.516 | |
2011-06-01 | Senate Committee Amendment 2212s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.516 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-2212s, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/12/11, Room 100, State House, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 11, Pg.194 | |
2011-03-15 | House Reconsideration (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Failed Division Vote 59-240; House Journal 26, PG.809 | |
2011-03-15 | House Ought to Pass (Rep Jasper): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-79; House Journal 26, PG.805-809 | |
2011-03-15 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 101-197; House Journal 26, PG.805-807 | |
2011-03-10 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 22, PG.554-555 | |
2011-03-10 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 15 (Vote 9-6; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.554-555 | |
2011-03-08 | House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/9/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-02-09 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 (Orig 10:30 Amendment) | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 194 |